Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB320 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill April 15, 2021
Bill March 4, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 3, 2021