Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB348 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 11, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021