Senate | 05/02/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rosino |