Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 9, 2022

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2022