Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Virgin
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named Garvin, McCortney, Simpson, Standridge, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Remove as author Senator McCortney; authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|