Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB408 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 14, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2021
Bill March 31, 2021