Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Section 6 in its entirety
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Line item vetoed 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Hall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
SCs named Thompson, Treat, Hall, McCortney, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Special Conference Committee on ARPA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
SCs named GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Thompson
|
|
|