Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB429 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 15, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022