Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB445 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2021