Senate | 05/02/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2022 | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/27/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 8 | ||
House | 04/27/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/08/2021 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Select Agencies Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Frix (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Taylor |