Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB462 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 28, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021