Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 8, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021