Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 13
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley, CrosswhiteHader, Williams, Echols, Olsen
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Remove Representative Martinez as principal House author and substitute with Representative McBride
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Martinez (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|