Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB503 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 4, 2021

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021