Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Virgin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 23
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Montgomery
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure failed: Ayes: 24 Nays: 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Pae
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery
|
|
|