Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB511 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 14, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 9, 2021