Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
SCs named Taylor, Leewright, Paxton, Rosino, Garvin, Dossett (J.J.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|