Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB522 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill March 11, 2021

Amended

Bill April 9, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 9, 2021