Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 12
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jech
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom, Jett
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|