Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 11, 2021