Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
SCs named Quinn, Montgomery, Garvin, Newhouse, Stanley, Brooks, Matthews
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Sneed (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|