Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2022
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 17, 2022

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill April 1, 2021