Senate | 04/23/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Phillips | ||
House | 04/19/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McEntire, Davis | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2021 | Remove Representative McEntire as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pae | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Newhouse |