Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021