Senate | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 25 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/30/2021 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 6 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm |