Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB585 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2021

Amended

Bill March 30, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021