Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Coauthored by Nollan
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Kendrix
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Randleman
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|