Senate | 04/07/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/07/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/06/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/05/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/05/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/24/2021 | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules | ||
Senate | 03/02/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/02/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/01/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Luttrell (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Montgomery |