Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 6, 2021

Amended

Bill March 24, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021