Senate
|
05/28/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Dahm, Garvin
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Sean), Hardin (David), Olsen, Boles, Lowe (Dick), Bashore
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
2 CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
2 CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Kendrix
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
2 CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Further conference granted, same conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Steagall
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Merrick
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Quinn
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
SCs named Standridge, Pugh, Quinn, Taylor, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Remove as author Senator Dahm; authored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Remove as coauthor Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 32; Ayes: 68 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Standridge
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stearman, Humphrey, McDugle
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Withdrawn from Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|