LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB658
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma Senate Bill SB658
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session
Oklahoma Senate Bill SB658
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
January 21, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 20, 2021
Compare
Bill
March 8, 2021
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 26, 2021
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 9, 2021
Compare
Bill
February 10, 2021
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 24, 2021
Compare
Bill
April 9, 2021
Compare