Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Talley
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|