Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Newton
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Withdrawn from Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
Withdrawn from Elections and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lowe (Dick)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Jech
|
|
|