Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 15, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021