Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Approved by Governor 04/21/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Randleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Jech
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Burns
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Coauthored by Senator Taylor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
SCs named McCortney, Rosino, Daniels, Simpson, Hicks, Dossett (J.A.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2021
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Insurance Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|