Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB737 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2022

Amended

Bill April 7, 2021
Bill February 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill February 22, 2021