House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Insurance | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Davis (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/18/2021 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Standridge |