Senate | 04/19/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/13/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2021 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/08/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/04/2021 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Simpson |