Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB76 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 13, 2021

Amended

Bill April 1, 2021
Bill February 8, 2021