Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Approved by Governor 03/31/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 30; Ayes: 68 Nays: 19
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy), Caldwell (Chad), Hilbert, Davis, ODonnell, Echols, Baker, Hasenbeck, McCall
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Second Reading, direct to Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator David
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|