Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB783 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 31, 2021

Amended

Bill March 10, 2021
Bill February 24, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2021