House | 04/06/2022 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams, Conley | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute State Powers Committee | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Withdrawn from Calendar; referred to State Powers Committee | ||
House | 04/06/2021 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/10/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/03/2021 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bullard |