Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB784 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 6, 2022

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 4, 2021