Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2021
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2021
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Fugate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator David
|
|
|