Senate | 05/07/2021 | Approved by Governor 05/07/2021 | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Coauthored by Manger | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/31/2021 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/22/2021 | Coauthored by Representative Hardin (Tommy) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/11/2021 | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Pugh |