Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB868 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 22, 2021
Bill March 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2021

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 12, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2021