Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/26/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 5
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2022
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
SCs named Treat, Dugger, Floyd, Hall, Haste, Rosino, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Phillips
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
CR; Do Pass Technology Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Technology
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
remove as principal author Representative Hilbert and substitute with Representative Boatman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2021
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|