Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB924 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2022
Bill March 11, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2022

Amended

Bill March 31, 2021
Bill February 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 18, 2022