Senate | 05/04/2022 | Approved by Governor 05/04/2022 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/28/2022 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | General Order | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 03/28/2022 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/22/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/21/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Remove as author Senator Bergstrom; authored by Senator Murdock | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |