Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB942 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 5, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022